This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/06/2019 at 11:37:57 (UTC).

Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC vs. David Gonzalez, Nancy Garcia

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against David Gonzalez, Nancy Garcia. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1892

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC

Defendants

Gonzalez, David

Garcia, Nancy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Oliver, Leland Chance

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketOrder-Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketEviction-Request for Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketAffidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketPayment Information: Amount: $130.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketPayment Information: Amount: $196.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC; Parties Against: Gonzalez, David and others

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketDisposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less