This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 05/15/2023 at 03:07:46 (UTC).

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC vs. Arturo Rodriguez Vargas, Renee Rodriguez, ARTHUR RODRIGUEZ AND ALL CURRENT OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Arturo Rodriguez Vargas, Renee Rodriguez, ARTHUR RODRIGUEZ AND ALL CURRENT OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0543

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC

Defendants

Vargas, Arturo Rodriguez

ARTHUR RODRIGUEZ AND ALL CURRENT OCCUPANTS

Rodriguez, Renee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Akapo, Mary

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Dismissed; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Wed Dec 07 08:00:00 CST 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketEviction-Request for Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $258.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less