This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/10/2018 at 11:52:06 (UTC).

Carl Gutkowski vs. Bruce Duren Hunter

Case Summary

On 08/04/2017 Carl Gutkowski filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Bruce Duren Hunter. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3588

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gutkowski, Carl

Houston, TX 77093

Defendant

Hunter, Bruce Duren

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robbins, Kathleen Rolston

P O Box 7049

Houston, TX 77248

Defendant Attorneys

Jereb, Ted

11931 Wickchester#201

Houston, TX 77043

Jereb, Theodore B

11931 Wickchester #201

Houston, TX 77043

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2018
  • Case Filed in Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Transcript of Judgment from Justice Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Small Claims-Alias Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Order-Transfer Venue with Consent 502.4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Disposition: All Other Dispositions Except Dismissal (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less