This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 05/15/2023 at 04:18:57 (UTC).

Capital One, N.A. vs. Ryan S Simecek

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 Capital One, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ryan S Simecek. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6683

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One, N.A.

Defendant

Simecek, Ryan S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ford, Joshua W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketOrder-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketRequest for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Capital One, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less