This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:12:19 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (Usa) Na vs. Wayne L Mentzel

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Capital One Bank Usa Na filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Wayne L Mentzel. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8864

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (Usa) Na

Defendant

Mentzel, Wayne L

Houston, TX 77057-4777

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moss, Michael A

P.O. Box 3340

Lubbock, TX 79452

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Mentzel, Wayne L; Parties Against: Capital One Bank (Usa) Na

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Capital One Bank (Usa) Na

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less