This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/24/2018 at 12:26:55 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (Usa) N.A. vs. Linda Cedillo

Case Summary

On 05/23/2016 Capital One Bank Usa N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Linda Cedillo. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3855

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.

4851 Cox Rd.

Glen Allen, VA 23060

Defendant

CEDILLO, LINDA

Houston, TX 77023-2735

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOSS, MICHAEL A

Po Box 3968

Lubbock, TX 79452

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2016
  • Notice-Default Judgment 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Motion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Exhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Exhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Judgment: Parties For: Capital One Bank (Usa) N.A.; Parties Against: Cedillo, Linda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Moss