Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:11:49 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (usa) N.a. vs. Estie Thompson

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Capital One Bank usa N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Estie Thompson. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2817

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (usa) N.a.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Thompson, Estie

Houston, TX 77084

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Baxter, Kyla Nicole

1120 Metrocrest Dr. Ste 100

Carrollton, TX 75006

Defendant Attorney

Ghuneim, Wisam S

3115 Preston Road Suite F

Pasadena, TX 77505

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Capital One Bank (usa) N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less