This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:10:37 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A. vs. Donna Romeo

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Capital One Bank Usa , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Donna Romeo. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8808

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

Defendant

Romeo, Donna

Pasadena, TX 77504-2931

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moss, Michael A

P.O. Box 3340

Lubbock, TX 79452

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketResponse Due Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketOrder-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less