This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:07:22 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., assignee of HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A. vs. Alonzo K. Edwards

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A , assignee of HSBC BANK NEVADA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Alonzo K Edwards. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8737

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., assignee of HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A.

Defendant

Edwards, Alonzo K.

Houston, TX 77004-6531

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moss, Michael A

P.O. Box 3340

Lubbock, TX 79452

Other Attorneys

Teal, Amber

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketOrder-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMotion Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., assignee of HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less