This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/25/2019 at 22:24:55 (UTC).

Camillo Properties As Agent for Camillo Houses #2 Llc vs. Uchenna Agim

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Camillo Properties As Agent for Camillo Houses 2 Llc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Uchenna Agim. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2727

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Camillo Properties As Agent for Camillo Houses #2 Llc

Defendant

AGIM, UCHENNA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketRelease of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketEviction-Request for Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Camillo Properties As Agent for Camillo Houses #2 Llc; Parties Against: Agim, Uchenna; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%; Judgment Amount: $1275.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketDisposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Camillo Properties Ltd is a litigant