Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/20/2018 at 14:48:48 (UTC).

Cah 2014-1 Borrower Llc D/B/A Colony American Homes vs. Paul Schendel, Nora Schendel

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 Cah 2014-1 Borrower Llc D/B/A Colony American Homes filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Paul Schendel, Nora Schendel. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4777

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAH 2014-1 BORROWER LLC D/B/A COLONY AMERICAN HOMES

Defendants

SCHENDEL, PAUL

Humble, TX 77346

SCHENDEL, NORA

Humble, TX 77346

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DEBELAK III, ROBERT PAUL

3200 Southwest Freeway Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77027

Debelak, Robert Paul, III

1001 Fannin St Suite 2700

Houston, TX 77002

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2015
  • Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Dismissed wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Eviction-Citation Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Cah 2014-1 Borrower Llc D/B/A Colony American Homes; Parties Against: Schendel, Paul and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Disposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less