Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/28/2017 at 15:02:54 (UTC).

Cach Llc vs. Alberto Riano Nino

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 Cach Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Alberto Riano Nino. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1175

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH LLC

15455 Dallas Parkway Suite 6013

Addison, TX 75001

Defendant

NINO, ALBERTO RIANO

Houston, TX 77072

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINSON, CODY LEE

275 W Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2016
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Dismissed for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Event: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Wed Jul 06 07:30:00 CDT 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Event: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution; Completion Date: Wed Jul 06 07:30:00 CDT 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Judgment: Parties For: Cach Llc; Parties Against: Nino, Alberto Riano

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Disposition: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less