This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/24/2018 at 12:46:05 (UTC).

Brown Jordan Company Llc vs. Stone Illusions, Inc. Aka and Dba Stone Illisions, and the Patio

Case Summary

On 02/12/2016 Brown Jordan Company Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Stone Illusions, Inc Aka and Dba Stone Illisions, and the Patio. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9098

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN JORDAN COMPANY LLC

Defendants

STONE ILLISIONS, INC. AKA AND DBA STONE ILLISIONS, AND THE PATIO

Stone Illusions, Inc. Aka and Dba Stone Illisions, and the Patio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ellison, Marc Lance

2211 Norfolk Suite 510

Houston, TX 77098

Other Attorneys

Ellison, Marc L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketService

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • DocketSummary Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • DocketHearing: Motion Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • DocketHearing: Motion Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Brown Jordan Company Llc; Parties Against: Stone Illisions, Inc. Aka and Dba Stone Illisions, and the Patio; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%; Judgment Amount: $6044.90

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • DocketDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROWN JORDAN COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLISON, MARC L