This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/30/2018 at 14:54:26 (UTC).

Brian Parizo vs. Chasity Graham

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 Brian Parizo filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Chasity Graham. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5186

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Parizo, Brian

Seabrook, TX 77586

Defendant

Graham, Chasity

Webster, TX 77598

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2017
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Pending Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Order-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Request for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $119.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Parizo, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu Dec 07 15:00:00 CST 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: Parizo, Brian; Parties Against: Graham, Chasity; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $1794.97

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less