This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/31/2018 at 13:15:19 (UTC).

Bmi Property Management Llc vs. Cory Williams, Mack Spencer

Case Summary

On 04/19/2017 Bmi Property Management Llc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Cory Williams, Mack Spencer. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5791

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bmi Property Management Llc

1925 Southwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77098

BMI Property Management LLC.

1925 Southwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77098

Defendants

Williams, Cory

Houston, TX 77003

Spencer, Mack

Houston, TX 77003

Cory Williams and all Occupants

Houston, TX 77003

Not Classified By Court

Ta, Duc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hoaglund, Hunter A

909 Fannin St., Suite 3030

Houston, TX 77010

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2017
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Eviction-Request for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Eviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $75.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: BMI Property Management LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $116.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: BMI Property Management LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Hearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Hearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu May 04 09:00:00 CDT 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: Cory Williams and all Occupants and others; Parties Against: BMI Property Management LLC.; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMI Property Management LLC is a litigant