This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/10/2018 at 05:29:26 (UTC).

Billy Young, S &B Construction Services Inc vs. Graciela Bostick, Nexthome Realty Center, Donna Kelso, Superior Title Company, Jessie Snyder, Christopher Maynard

Case Summary

On 07/27/2017 Billy Young, S B Construction Services Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Graciela Bostick, Nexthome Realty Center, Donna Kelso, Superior Title Company, Jessie Snyder, Christopher Maynard. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6880

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

S&B Construction Services Inc

Young, Billy

S &B Construction Services Inc

Defendants

Snyder, Jessie

Nexthome Realty Center

Superior Title Company

Bostick, Graciela

Kelso, Donna

Maynard, Christopher

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rowland, Rebecca

Defendant Attorney

Baumann, Erik Christopher

Other Attorneys

Taylor, Gwendolyn Guinn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketRequest for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketOrder-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketSmall Claims-Amended Citation Money Damages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketAmended Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketMotion for Summary Disposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketAffidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketPayment Information: Amount: $194.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Young, Billy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketEvent: Motion Docket; Completion Date: Tue Dec 12 13:00:00 CST 2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketEvent: Motion Docket; Completion: Granted; Completion Date: Tue Sep 12 09:00:00 CDT 2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less