This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/29/2018 at 16:34:29 (UTC).

Berry Creek Condominiums vs. Fernando Dominguez

Case Summary

On 09/24/2013 Berry Creek Condominiums filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Fernando Dominguez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9506

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BERRY CREEK CONDOMINIUMS LTD

Berry Creek Condominiums

Defendant

DOMINGUEZ, FERNANDO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2013
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2013
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2013
  • DocketAppeal Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • DocketHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Berry Creek Condominiums Ltd; Parties Against: Dominguez, Fernando; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%; Judgment Amount: $1127.26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • DocketDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Berry Creek Condominiums LTD is a litigant