This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/30/2018 at 12:38:01 (UTC).

Befekadu Dilala vs. Accel Tax Service

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 Befekadu Dilala filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Accel Tax Service. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5201

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dilala, Befekadu

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant

Accel Tax Service

Serve: Gideon Kibe, Owner 3700 S Gessner Rd Ste 3730-A

Houston, TX 77063

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Writ of Execution-Money Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Notice-Default Judgment 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2017
  • Request for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Payment Information: Amount: $5.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Dilala, Befekadu

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Payment Information: Amount: $155.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Dilala, Befekadu

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $119.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Dilala, Befekadu

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Judgment: Parties For: Dilala, Befekadu; Parties Against: Accel Tax Service; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less