This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:10:30 (UTC).

BCH Gallery at Champions LLC Casa Del Mar vs. Satara Jones

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 BCH Gallery at Champions LLC Casa Del Mar filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Satara Jones. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8863

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BCH Gallery at Champions LLC Casa Del Mar

2431 Fm 1960 W.

Houston, TX 77068

Defendant

Jones, Satara

Houston, TX 77068

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketOrder Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Mon Jan 06 13:00:00 CST 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $121.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: BCH Gallery at Champions LLC Casa Del Mar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less