Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/31/2018 at 14:12:47 (UTC).

Baypointe Apartment Homes vs. Devonte Boyd

Case Summary

On 01/20/2017 Baypointe Apartment Homes filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Devonte Boyd. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2743

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Baypointe Apartment Homes

901 S Kobayashi Rd

Webster, TX 77598

Defendant

Boyd, Devonte

Webster, TX 77598

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Eviction-Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Order-Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Eviction-Request for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Eviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $130.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Baypointe Apartment Homes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $116.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Baypointe Apartment Homes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Hearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu Feb 09 14:00:00 CST 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: Baypointe Apartment Homes; Parties Against: Boyd, Devonte; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $1096.39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Disposition: Agreed Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less