This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/15/2018 at 07:19:32 (UTC).

Bargain Furniture vs. Oscar Alvarez

Case Summary

On 03/13/2013 Bargain Furniture filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Oscar Alvarez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7513

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bargain Furniture

Defendant

Alvarez, Oscar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Ghuneim, Wisam S

3115 Preston Road Suite F

Pasadena, TX 77505

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2013
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketHearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketHearing: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • DocketHearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • DocketHearing: Motion Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • DocketHearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Bargain Furniture; Parties Against: Alvarez, Oscar; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%; Judgment Amount: $2622.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GHUNEIM, WISAM