This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/09/2023 at 16:42:27 (UTC).

Bank of America, N.A. vs. Sijod L Al-Mosawi

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 Bank of America, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sijod L Al-Mosawi. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4901

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of America, N.A.

Defendant

Al-Mosawi, Sijod L

Houston, TX 77069

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garza, Michael J

Po Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011-5220

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • DocketFinal Judgment Order to Enforce Foreign Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketOther Documents Not Listed - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Bank of America, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less