Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/22/2021 at 04:25:14 (UTC).

Bank Of America N.A. vs. Ricardo Ardon

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 Bank Of America N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ricardo Ardon. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4475

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America N.A.

Defendant

Ardon, Ricardo

Humble, TX 77346

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephens, Thomas W

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011-5220

Defendant Attorney

Hagmann, Ryne

933 Nw 164Th Street, Suite 2

Edmond, OK 73013

Other Attorneys

Scott, Michael J

Garza, Michael J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Agreed Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketOrder-Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Bank Of America N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott, Michael J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Garza