This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 08/06/2022 at 05:51:41 (UTC).

Axiom Acquisition Ventures, LLC vs. Dylan Thornburg

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 Axiom Acquisition Ventures, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Dylan Thornburg. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9224

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Axiom Acquisition Ventures, LLC

Defendant

Thornburg, Dylan

La Porte, TX 77571

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adams, Michael Jason

10004 Wurzbach Rd #292

San Antonio, TX 78230

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Axiom Acquisition Ventures, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AXIOM ACQUISITION VENTURES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, MICHAEL JASON