This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 08/07/2020 at 03:27:39 (UTC).

Angela Thoede vs. Liberty Mutual Group Inc, Liberty Mutual Auto and Home Services LLC

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Angela Thoede filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Group Inc, Liberty Mutual Auto and Home Services LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6201

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thoede, Angela

Houston, TX 77043

Defendants

Liberty Mutual Auto and Home Services LLC

173 Berkeley St

Boston, MA 02116

Liberty Mutual Group Inc

173 Berkeley St

Boston, MA 02116

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Seymore, Paul

801 Louisiana Street, Suite 500

Houston, TX 77002

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • HearingDescription: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • HearingHearing: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Thoede, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less