Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/30/2018 at 13:21:57 (UTC).

Always In Season, Inc vs. Healthscripts Specialty Pharmacy, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/22/2017 Always In Season, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Healthscripts Specialty Pharmacy, LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6186

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Always In Season, Inc

Defendant

Healthscripts Specialty Pharmacy, LLC

1100 Jackson Street Suite B

Richmond, TX 77469

Receiver

West, James A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kovach, James F

170 Westcott Street

Houston, TX 77007

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2018
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Certified Copy Requested Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Motion Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Notice-Default Judgment 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Motion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Debt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Payment Information: Amount: $4.25; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Kovach, James F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $44.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Always In Season, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Hearing: Motion Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: Always In Season, Inc; Parties Against: Healthscripts Specialty Pharmacy, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kovach, James F