This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/13/2023 at 17:32:52 (UTC).

Alvaro Sanchez vs. Laura Zapata

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 Alvaro Sanchez filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Laura Zapata. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6572

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sanchez, Alvaro

Defendant

Zapata, Laura

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Leticia, Leal

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $130.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Sanchez, Alvaro

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketWrit Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Sanchez, Alvaro; Parties Against: Zapata, Laura; Post-Judgment Interest: 7.5000%; Judgment Amount: $0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DispositionDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketOrder-Final Judgment Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketLetter of Representation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $129.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Sanchez, Alvaro

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less