This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/03/2018 at 00:35:04 (UTC).

Altisource Residential Lp and Ocwen Loan Servicing Llc vs. Lydia E Jimenez

Case Summary

On 09/19/2013 Altisource Residential Lp and Ocwen Loan Servicing Llc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Lydia E Jimenez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9528

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Altisource Residential Lp and Ocwen Loan Servicing Llc

Defendant

Jimenez, Lydia E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Oliver, Leland Chance

5950 Berkshire Lane Suite 410

Dallas, TX 75225

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2013
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketAppeal Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • DocketHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Altisource Residential Lp and Ocwen Loan Servicing Llc; Parties Against: Jimenez, Lydia E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • DocketDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Oliver, Leland Chance