This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/16/2022 at 04:18:40 (UTC).

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF MATT BLEVINS vs. A2 Motors LLC, Nijem Akram Haifa

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF MATT BLEVINS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against A2 Motors LLC, Nijem Akram Haifa. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1651

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF MATT BLEVINS

Defendants

A2 Motors LLC

22850 Morton Ranch Rd

Katy, TX 77449

Haifa, Nijem Akram

Not Classified By Court

Monterrosa, Edgar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Loftis, Paula

P.O. Box 655441

Dallas, TX 75265

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketPending Judge Trial Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF MATT BLEVINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Loftis, Paula