This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/31/2018 at 12:33:21 (UTC).

Alfred J Martus, Jr. vs. Maynard J Wilson

Case Summary

On 08/08/2017 Alfred J Martus, Jr filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Maynard J Wilson. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0696

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martus, Alfred J, Jr.

Houston, TX 77084

Defendant

Wilson, Maynard J

Humble, TX 77338

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Murphy, Courtney

50 Briar Hollow Ln, Ste 505 W

Houston, TX 77027

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2018
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Additional Documents Filed by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Jury Fee Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Exhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $22.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Murphy, Courtney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $119.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Martus, Alfred J, Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Hearing: Jury Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Judgment: Parties For: Martus, Alfred J, Jr.; Parties Against: Wilson, Maynard J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less