This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 09/03/2023 at 14:19:53 (UTC).

Alexis Hurt vs. Ikea Holdings US, Inc, Ikea US Retail, LLC, Ikea Property, Inc

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 Alexis Hurt filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Ikea Holdings US, Inc, Ikea US Retail, LLC, Ikea Property, Inc. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3220

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hurt, Alexis

Defendants

Ikea Holdings US, Inc

Ikea Property, Inc

Ikea US Retail, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Basu, Annie

Defendant Attorney

Schlak, Gregory A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $22.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Ikea US Retail, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • HearingDescription: Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • HearingHearing: Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu Feb 02 10:00:00 CST 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketOrder Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketSmall Claims-Amended Citation Money Damages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketMotion Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketAmended Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketAmended Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Hurt, Alexis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less