This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/23/2022 at 15:36:09 (UTC).

Adam Lee vs. Monster, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 Adam Lee filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Monster, Inc. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1504

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lee, Adam

Katy, TX 77494

Defendant

Monster, Inc.

280 Old County Rd#435

Brisbane, CA 94005

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Roberts, Alasdair Andrew

1235 North Loop West, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77008

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • HearingHearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Dismissed; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Wed Sep 07 09:00:00 CDT 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Monster, Inc.; Parties Against: Lee, Adam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • HearingDescription: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • HearingHearing: Hearing; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss with Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketOrder Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMotion Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Lee, Adam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONSTER LLC is a litigant