This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/27/2018 at 13:50:28 (UTC).

Acquisition Broadway Square Llc D/B/A Vista Verde Apartments vs. Oice Toler

Case Summary

On 01/25/2016 Acquisition Broadway Square Llc D/B/A Vista Verde Apartments filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Oice Toler. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2428

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACQUISITION BROADWAY SQUARE LLC D/B/A VISTA VERDE APARTMENTS

Defendant

TOLER, OICE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketPending

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • DocketEviction-Notice Tenant Filing Statement of Inability Pay App

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • DocketEviction-Notice Filing Statement Inability Pay Apl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • DocketConversion Judgment Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • DocketAppeal Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Acquisition Broadway Square Llc D/B/A Vista Verde Apartments; Parties Against: Toler, Oice; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%; Judgment Amount: $1317.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • DocketDisposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACQUISITION BROADWAY SQUARE, LLC dba ALTA VERDE is a litigant