This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 08/22/2022 at 03:13:37 (UTC).

ACCOUNTABLE HEALTHCARE STAFFING, INC., A CORPORATION vs. CANYON ATLANTIC-PLANO, LLC AKA AND DBA CANYON ATLANTIC-PLANO, PLANO SURGICAL HOSPITAL, PLANO SURGICAL, AND TEXAS SURGICAL HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 ACCOUNTABLE HEALTHCARE STAFFING, INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CANYON ATLANTIC-PLANO, LLC AKA AND DBA CANYON ATLANTIC-PLANO, PLANO SURGICAL HOSPITAL, PLANO SURGICAL, AND TEXAS SURGICAL HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1466

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACCOUNTABLE HEALTHCARE STAFFING, INC., A CORPORATION

Defendant

CANYON ATLANTIC-PLANO, LLC AKA AND DBA CANYON ATLANTIC-PLANO, PLANO SURGICAL HOSPITAL, PLANO SURGICAL, AND TEXAS SURGICAL HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Totz, Jon D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/02/2022

DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2022

DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketProposed Order Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketOther Documents Not Listed - Efile

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022

DocketService Return

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2022

DocketDebt Claim-Citation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2022

DocketCitation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2022

FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: ACCOUNTABLE HEALTHCARE STAFFING, INC., A CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2022

DocketOriginal Petition Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2022

DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

[+] Read More [-] Read Less