This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 08/02/2021 at 05:12:22 (UTC).

Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc vs. Joseph T Barton

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Joseph T Barton. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4994

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc

Defendant

Barton, Joseph T

Houston, TX 77070

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cooper, Matthew W

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011-5220

Defendant Attorney

Fernandez, David A

2190 N Loop West Suite 333

Houston, TX 77018

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper