Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 07/12/2021 at 03:25:18 (UTC).

Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC vs. Jonathan Maldonado

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jonathan Maldonado. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0599

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC

Defendant

Maldonado, Jonathan

Baytown, TX 77521

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cooper, Matthew W

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011-5220

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketOrder-Authorizing Person to Serve Process 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper