This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/15/2018 at 14:48:34 (UTC).

3045 Golfcrest Llc vs. Michael Wilson

Case Summary

On 12/23/2014 3045 Golfcrest Llc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Michael Wilson. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1434

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

3045 GOLFCREST LLC

Defendant

WILSON, MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2015
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketOrder-Final Judgment Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: 3045 Golfcrest Llc; Parties Against: Wilson, Michael

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3045 Golfcrest LLC is a litigant