This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/20/2015 at 13:38:07 (UTC).

ZYLKA-PARISI, CAROLINE FRANCES vs. A W CHESTERTON

Case Summary

On 10/06/2005 ZYLKA-PARISI, CAROLINE FRANCES filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4371

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

ZYLKA-PARISI, CAROLINE FRANCES

PARISI, VITO

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

MORTON INTERNATIONAL INC (FKA MORTON THIOKOL)

PARISI, VITO (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY

GUARDLINE INC

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY INC

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

OWENS ILLINOIS INC

T H AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION L L C

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (FKA UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTIC

UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTIC COMPANY INC

UNIROYAL HOLDING INC

VIACOM INC

ANY AND ALL DEFENDANTS IN PLAINTIFFS PETITION OR AMENDMENTS THERETO OR

BIRD INCORPORATED

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

48 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATHEN, FRANK J. II

Defendant Attorneys

WADE, TODD N.

POWERS, JAMES H.

FARRELL, WILLIAM HOWARD

FRASE, LAURA ANN

ELLISTON, GARY D.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

MOIR, PETER A.

LOFTIN, STEPHEN MCBRIDE

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

CLARY, BRIAN S.

Other Attorneys

WILKINSON, MELODY M.

OLIVARES, JOSE F.

WHITE, CLAY M.

ADAMS, ROBERT L.

HARDING, LISA D.

LYNN, LAWRENCE A.

FERRELL, MELISSA K.

BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID

ALMQUIST, ARTHUR RAY

16 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • AMENDED ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2009
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2009
  • ORDER SIGNED DESIGNATING CASE TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR. Person Filing - AMERICAN STANDARD INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2005
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LYNN, LAWRENCE A. Person Filing - FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - WADE, TODD N. Person Filing - KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RICHARDSON, H. TRACY III Person Filing - SHERWIN WILLIAMS COMPANY THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ALMQUIST, ARTHUR RAY Person Filing - GOODRICH CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - REYNARD, DAVID D. JR. Person Filing - RPM INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - REYNARD, DAVID D. JR. Person Filing - BONDEX INTERNATIONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - PARISI, VITO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - ZYLKA-PARISI, CAROLINE FRANCES

    Read MoreRead Less