This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:41:11 (UTC).

ZIMMERMAN, ROBERT E JR (AS THE PROPERTY vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 ZIMMERMAN, ROBERT E JR AS THE PROPERTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7381

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ZIMMERMAN, ROBERT E JR (AS THE PROPERTY OWNER)

ZIMMERMAN, NANCY W (AS THE PROPERTY OWNER)

PROPERTY OWNERS

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD OF THE HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCKENNEY, HUGH L.

Defendant Attorney

WHITE-CHAFFER, TAMMY YOLANDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2005
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2004
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2004
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WHITE-CHAFFER, TAMMY YOLANDA Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCKENNEY, HUGH L. Person Filing - PROPERTY OWNERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCKENNEY, HUGH L. Person Filing - ZIMMERMAN, NANCY W (AS THE PROPERTY OWNER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCKENNEY, HUGH L. Person Filing - ZIMMERMAN, ROBERT E JR (AS THE PROPERTY OWNER)

    Read MoreRead Less