This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:40:19 (UTC).

ZENITH CAPITAL GROUP LC vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 ZENITH CAPITAL GROUP LC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7376

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZENITH CAPITAL GROUP LC

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAN KERREBROOK, MARY A.

Defendant Attorney

MCCONNELL, ROBERT PATRICK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2004
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2004
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCCONNELL, ROBERT PATRICK Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - VAN KERREBROOK, MARY A. Person Filing - ZENITH CAPITAL GROUP LC

    Read MoreRead Less