This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:11:31 (UTC).

ZEMORA, EUFEMIA vs. ZAMORA, RAYMON

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 ZEMORA, EUFEMIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ZAMORA, RAYMON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7603

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZEMORA, EUFEMIA

Defendant

ZAMORA, RAYMON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2004
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2004
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2004
  • PLAINTIFF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2004
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2004
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2004
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2004
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less