This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/13/2015 at 00:48:36 (UTC).

ZELLERS, KAREN (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE vs. A W CHESTERTON

Case Summary

On 01/12/2005 ZELLERS, KAREN IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2946

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY

GEORGIA PACIFIC CORPORATION

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

ELLIOTT, MARTY (IND AND AS PERSONAL REP OF THE HEIRS AND ESTATE OF

ELLIOTT, BONNIE (DAUGHTER OF JOHN DAVID ELLIOT) (DECEASED)

ELLIOTT, JIM BO (SON OF JOHN DAVID ELLIOTT) (DECEASED)

ALBANY INTERNATIONAL (DELAWARE CORPORATION)

ELLIOTT COMPANY

SCAPA DRYER FABRICS INC

ZELLERS, KAREN (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS AND

STROUSE, RICHARD (SON OF LEONARD W ZELLERS) (DECEASED)

STROUSE, NICOLE (DAUGHTER OF LEONARD W ZELLERS) (DECEASED)

WILSON, JERRY LYNN

A W CHESTERTON

A W CHESTERTON COMPANY

AQUA-CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION)

CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC ( FKA D B RILEY RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER

D B RILEY INC

81 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE

BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID

WADE, TODD N.

THACKSTON, ROBERT EDWIN

MEADERS, KIM MARIE

WATHEN, FRANK J. II

ROACH, CRYSTAL

OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR.

HUEBER, SUSAN JAN

WHITE, CLAY M.

HAMILTON, PAUL EDWARD

Other Attorneys

POWERS, JAMES H.

ADAMS, ROBERT L.

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

LYNN, LAWRENCE A.

FERRELL, MELISSA K.

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

RHODES, KENNETH D.

PALMER, RAYMOND C. JR.

FARRELL, WILLIAM HOWARD

28 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2015
  • PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - FULLER, L. HAYES III Person Filing - ITT INDUSTRIES INC (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BELL & GOSSETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2010
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - HENDRYX, MICHAEL Person Filing - CBS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - HENDRYX, MICHAEL Person Filing - VIACOM INC (SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - WADE, TODD N. Person Filing - KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - WADE, TODD N. Person Filing - KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WADE, TODD N. Person Filing - KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - WADE, TODD N. Person Filing - KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK Person Filing - GEORGIA PACIFIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK Person Filing - GEORGIA PACIFIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK Person Filing - GEORGIA PACIFIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLACK, LOU THOMPSON Person Filing - ZELLERS, KAREN (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS AND

    Read MoreRead Less