Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:30:40 (UTC).

YOUSSEF, YASMEEN DORIA vs. ZAMARRON, ERNESTO

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 YOUSSEF, YASMEEN DORIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ZAMARRON, ERNESTO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is URSULA A. HALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9383

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

URSULA A. HALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

YOUSSEF, YASMEEN DORIA

YOUSSEF, ANN MANRIQUEZ

Defendants

ZAMARROW, ERNESTO

ZAMARRON, ERNESTO

Houston, TX 77003

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANSTEAN, AUSTIN LEE

Defendant Attorney

GARCIA, SANDRA

 

Court Documents

Exhibit 7

06/02/2020: Exhibit 7

Exhibit 6

06/02/2020: Exhibit 6

Exhibit 5

06/02/2020: Exhibit 5

Exhibit 4

06/02/2020: Exhibit 4

Exhibit 3

06/02/2020: Exhibit 3

Exhibit 2

06/02/2020: Exhibit 2

Exhibit 1

06/02/2020: Exhibit 1

Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Medical and Billing Affidavits - Ann

06/02/2020: Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Medical and Billing Affidavits - Ann

Exhibit 6

06/02/2020: Exhibit 6

Exhibit 5

06/02/2020: Exhibit 5

Exhibit 4

06/02/2020: Exhibit 4

Exhibit 3

06/02/2020: Exhibit 3

Exhibit 1

06/02/2020: Exhibit 1

Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Medical and Billing Records Affidavits

06/02/2020: Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Medical and Billing Records Affidavits

Defendant's Original Answer

04/14/2020: Defendant's Original Answer

Citaiton for Youssef Zamarron

04/16/2020: Citaiton for Youssef Zamarron

Plaintiff's Original Petition

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Youssef - Civil Process Request

03/30/2020: Youssef - Civil Process Request

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GARCIA, SANDRA; Person Filing: ZAMARRON, ERNESTO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ZAMARRON, ERNESTO; Issued: 3/31/2020; Served: 4/8/2020; Tracking: 73739569; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: VANSTEAN, AUSTIN LEE; Person Filing: YOUSSEF, ANN MANRIQUEZ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: VANSTEAN, AUSTIN LEE; Person Filing: YOUSSEF, YASMEEN DORIA;

    Read MoreRead Less