This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/26/2021 at 07:20:54 (UTC).

YOUNG, SHAMARION vs. TACO BELL OF AMERICA LLC

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 YOUNG, SHAMARION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TACO BELL OF AMERICA LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1854

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOUNG, SHAMARION

Defendant

TACO BELL OF AMERICA LLC

Other

TACO BELL OF AMERICA LLC (A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY

1999 Bryan St

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARMSTRONG, SCOTT PARKER

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

03/02/2021: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

03/02/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

Return of Service

03/08/2021: Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TACO BELL OF AMERICA LLC (A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY; Issued: 3/2/2021; Served: 3/4/2021; Tracking: 73845700; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ARMSTRONG, SCOTT PARKER; Person Filing: YOUNG, SHAMARION;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Taco Bell of America LLc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARMSTRONG, SCOTT PARKER