This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/15/2021 at 07:30:06 (UTC).

YAZDANI-KEYHANI, PARVANEH vs. KROGER TEXAS L P

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 YAZDANI-KEYHANI, PARVANEH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KROGER TEXAS L P. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1108

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YAZDANI-KEYHANI, PARVANEH

Defendant

KROGER TEXAS L P

Other

KROGER TEXAS L P MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARKS, SHARDE'

Defendant Attorney

AKERS, BROCK C.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

09/21/2021: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Civil Process Request Form

09/21/2021: Civil Process Request Form

Citation

10/08/2021: Citation

DEFENDANTS APPLICATION AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

10/01/2021: DEFENDANTS APPLICATION AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

Defendants Original Answer

10/01/2021: Defendants Original Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AKERS, BROCK C.; Person Filing: KROGER TEXAS L P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: KROGER TEXAS L P MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 9/22/2021; Served: 9/27/2021; Tracking: 73919205; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MARKS, SHARDE'; Person Filing: YAZDANI-KEYHANI, PARVANEH;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AKERS, BROCK C.