This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/19/2022 at 07:36:19 (UTC).

WRIGHT, MARK VERNON vs. HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 04/25/2022 WRIGHT, MARK VERNON filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is URSULA A. HALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4828

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

URSULA A. HALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WRIGHT, MARK VERNON

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY PERSONAL BOND OFFICE

49 Danjacinto Street 1St Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY BAIL BOND BOARD

700 N. San Jacinto Street 1St Floor

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION

CLERK OF HARRIS COUNTY CRIMINAL COURT

CLERK OF HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK

HARRIS COUNTY 230TH CRIMINAL DISTRICT COURT

HARRIS COUNTY 177TH CRIMINAL DISTRICT COURT

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY 209TH CRIMINAL DISTRICT CLERK

Others

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77002

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY

49 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Houston, TX 77002

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JARAMILLO-MORENO, JESSICA MARIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • HearingCourt: 165; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY BAIL BOND BOARD; Issued: 5/10/2022; Tracking: 74004217; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PERSONAL BOND OFFICE; Issued: 5/10/2022; Tracking: 74004216; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS; Issued: 5/10/2022; Tracking: 73999198; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALL CRIMINAL COURTS BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 5/10/2022; Tracking: 73999197; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 5/10/2022; Tracking: 73999196; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 5/10/2022; Tracking: 73999193; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 5/10/2022; Tracking: 73999190; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN ROSE; Issued: 5/10/2022; Tracking: 73999188; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY; Issued: 5/10/2022; Tracking: 73999185; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 5/10/2022; Tracking: 73999181; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 4/27/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JARAMILLO-MORENO, JESSICA MARIE; Person Filing: WRIGHT, MARK VERNON;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY BAIL BOND BOARD is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION EXPUNCTION UNIT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS DEPARMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD is a litigant