This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:31:44 (UTC).

WORLEY, RICHARD D (II) vs. BULLRITOS INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 WORLEY, RICHARD D II filed an Other lawsuit against BULLRITOS INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1620

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORLEY, RICHARD D (II)

Intervenor Plaintiff

MCGEE, JOHN R

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

CHILES, BRETT

Houston, TX 77057

BULLRITOS INVESTMENT GROUP LLC

TOWNS, KELLER

Houston, TX 77057

BULLRITOS INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC

675 Bering Drive Suite 580

Houston, TX 77057

PRIEST, ANDREW

Houston, TX 77057

GORDON, KEVIN

Houston, TX 77057

BROUSSARD, JAMES A

Pearland, TX 77581

BULLRITOS INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC (D/B/A BULLRITOS)

BULLRITOS

Others and Defendants

BULLRITOS INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC

675 Bering Drive Suite 580

Houston, TX 77057

BULLRITOS INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

675 Bering Drive Suite 580

Houston, TX 77054

BULLRITOS INVESTMENT GROUP LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED

Pearland, TX 77581

BULLRITOS INVESTMENT GROUP LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

2401 San Conero Drive

Pearland, TX 77581

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIGMON, ERNESTO DE ANDRE

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

EDGECOMB, CLARK IV

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Receipt

06/01/2020: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

06/01/2020: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

06/01/2020: Certified Mail Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

06/08/2020: Domestic Return Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

06/08/2020: Domestic Return Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

06/08/2020: Domestic Return Receipt

Citation

06/18/2020: Citation

Citation

06/18/2020: Citation

Request for Issuance of Service

05/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7016 0600 0001 0815 7037

05/27/2020: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7016 0600 0001 0815 7037

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7016 0600 0001 0815 7044

05/27/2020: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7016 0600 0001 0815 7044

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7016 0600 0001 0815 7051

05/27/2020: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7016 0600 0001 0815 7051

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7016 0600 0001 0815 7006

05/27/2020: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7016 0600 0001 0815 7006

Request for Issuance of Service

05/29/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/29/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/29/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/29/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: INTERVENTIONS; Person: PRIEST, ANDREW; Issued: 5/29/2020; Tracking: 73753856; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: INTERVENTIONS; Person: CHILES, BRETT; Issued: 5/29/2020; Tracking: 73753855; Deliver To: Domestic Relations Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: INTERVENTIONS; Person: TOWNS, KELLER; Issued: 5/29/2020; Tracking: 73753854; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: INTERVENTIONS; Person: BULLRITOS INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Issued: 5/29/2020; Tracking: 73753843; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: INTERVENTIONS; Person: BULLRITOS INVESTMENT GROUP LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Issued: 5/29/2020; Tracking: 73753842; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: EDGECOMB, CLARK IV; Person Filing: MCGEE, JOHN R;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BULLRITOS INVESTMENT GROUP LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 5/27/2020; Tracking: 73753121; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BULLRITOS INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 6/10/2020; Received: 6/18/2020; Tracking: 73753119; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TOWNS, KELLER; Issued: 5/27/2020; Tracking: 73753059; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PRIEST, ANDREW; Issued: 5/27/2020; Tracking: 73753056; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CHILES, BRETT; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 6/10/2020; Received: 6/18/2020; Tracking: 73753055; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BROUSSARD, JAMES A; Issued: 5/27/2020; Tracking: 73753054; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GORDON, KEVIN; Issued: 5/27/2020; Tracking: 73753053; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SIGMON, ERNESTO DE ANDRE; Person Filing: WORLEY, RICHARD D (II);

    Read MoreRead Less