This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/19/2022 at 03:03:05 (UTC).

WOODS, TERRY vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK OFFICE

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 WOODS, TERRY filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CORY SEPOLIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0540

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CORY SEPOLIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOODS, TERRY

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77002

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS

1200 Travis 16Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN BANKS

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON

205 W 14Th Street Suite 600

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHWORTH, KIMBERLY ANNE

Defendant Attorney

ROSE, BRIAN LYNN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • HearingCourt: 269; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR); Results: Passed; Comments: AGREED JUDGMENT TO FOLLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROSE, BRIAN LYNN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON; Issued: 1/18/2022; Tracking: 73957508; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN BANKS; Issued: 1/18/2022; Tracking: 73957504; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 1/18/2022; Tracking: 73957501; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS; Issued: 1/18/2022; Tracking: 73957495; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 1/18/2022; Tracking: 73957493; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE; Issued: 1/18/2022; Tracking: 73957489; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 1/18/2022; Tracking: 73957487; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 1/5/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ASHWORTH, KIMBERLY ANNE; Person Filing: WOODS, TERRY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY is a litigant

Latest cases where HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT is a litigant