This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:04:31 (UTC).

WOLFHAGEN, JANICE S vs. WOLFHAGEN, PETER G

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 WOLFHAGEN, JANICE S filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WOLFHAGEN, PETER G. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0362

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOLFHAGEN, JANICE S

Defendant

WOLFHAGEN, PETER G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMPSON, C. ALLAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2005
  • QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2005
  • SETTLED/NON-SUITED (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2005
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2005
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2005
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SIMPSON, C. ALLAN Person Filing - WOLFHAGEN, JANICE S

    Read MoreRead Less