Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:42:59 (UTC).

WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF vs. JUBILEE WESTERN LLC

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JUBILEE WESTERN LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9510

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF

Defendant

JUBILEE WESTERN LLC

Receiver

CRUNK, SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAUVIN, CHRISTOPHER LYN

1722 Routh Stre

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

Envelope

04/07/2020: Envelope

Letter

04/07/2020: Letter

Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of receiver bond per order of the court

04/20/2020: Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of receiver bond per order of the court

Clerk's certificate of cash bond in lieu of receiver bond per order of the court

04/20/2020: Clerk's certificate of cash bond in lieu of receiver bond per order of the court

Cover letter

05/20/2020: Cover letter

Report of Receiver for the Month of April 2020

05/20/2020: Report of Receiver for the Month of April 2020

Oath of Receiver

03/31/2020: Oath of Receiver

Exhibit A

03/26/2020: Exhibit A

Proposed Agreed Order Appointing Receiver

03/26/2020: Proposed Agreed Order Appointing Receiver

Exhibit 05

03/26/2020: Exhibit 05

Exhibit 04

03/26/2020: Exhibit 04

Exhibit 03

03/26/2020: Exhibit 03

Exhibit 02

03/26/2020: Exhibit 02

Exhibit 01

03/26/2020: Exhibit 01

PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED ORIGINAL PETITION AND AGREED APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY RECEIVER

03/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED ORIGINAL PETITION AND AGREED APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY RECEIVER

ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

03/27/2020: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/27/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO APPOINT RECEIVER GRANTED; Order Signed: 3/27/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CHAUVIN, CHRISTOPHER LYN; Person Filing: WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF;

    Read MoreRead Less